Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 263 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5178 Week
» 16415 Month
» 249335 Year
» 1914711 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80118 on 15/06/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Tue 15/06/1955 to Whitby (50G)
Withdrawal Tue 29/11/1966
Service Life 11 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1967 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
50G   Whitby (New) on 15/06/1955
50B   Neville Hill 5w/e 14/06/1958
66E   Carstairs 4w/e 02/11/1963
66A   Polmadie 5w/e 30/05/1964
     Withdrawn on 29/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 50G Whitby w/e 15/06/1955
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 66E Carstairs 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 09/05/1964
WDN   on 29/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/01/1962 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/06/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80118
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Whitby (50G)
   
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (66E)    
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
29/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80118    
02/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev