Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 232 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5147 Week
» 16384 Month
» 249304 Year
» 1914680 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80119 on 21/06/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 21/06/1955 to Whitby (50G)
Withdrawal Sat 29/05/1965
Service Life 9 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
50G   Whitby (New) on 21/06/1955
50E   Scarborough 4w/e 18/02/1956
50G   Whitby 4w/e 25/05/1956
50B   Neville Hill 5w/e 14/06/1958
66E   Carstairs 4w/e 02/11/1963
67E   Dumfries 4w/e 30/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 29/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 50G Whitby on 21/06/1955
ALLOC 50E Scarborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 50G Whitby 4w/e 26/05/1956
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 66E Carstairs 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 67E Dumfries 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   w/e 29/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/02/1962 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/06/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80119
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Whitby (50G)
   
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Scarborough (50E)    
25/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Whitby (50G)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (66E)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (67E)    
29/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80119    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev