Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 209 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5124 Week
» 16361 Month
» 249281 Year
» 1914657 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80120 on 06/07/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Mon 06/07/1955 to Whitby (50G)
Withdrawal Mon 01/05/1967
Service Life 11 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1967 at Campbells (Airdrie)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
50G   Whitby (New) on 06/07/1955
50B   Neville Hill 5w/e 14/06/1958
66E   Carstairs 4w/e 02/11/1963
66A   Polmadie 5w/e 30/05/1964
     Withdrawn on 01/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 50G Whitby on 06/07/1955
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 66E Carstairs 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 09/05/1964
WDN   on 06/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/07/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80120
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Whitby (50G)
   
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (66E)    
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
05/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    
01/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 80120    

prev prev