Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 273 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5188 Week
» 16425 Month
» 249345 Year
» 1914721 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80121 on 22/07/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Thu 22/07/1955 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Thu 02/06/1966
Service Life 10 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1966 at Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
61A   Kittybrewster (New) on 22/07/1955
61C   Keith 4w/e 26/11/1955
61B   Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 29/07/1961
     Withdrawn on 02/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 61A Kittybrewster on 22/07/1955
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 26/11/1955
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 29/07/1961
WDN   on 02/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/07/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80121
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
26/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
29/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
02/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80121    
08/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane    

prev prev