Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 40 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4955 Week
» 16192 Month
» 249112 Year
» 1914488 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80122 on 08/08/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 08/08/1955 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Sat 31/12/1966
Service Life 11 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1967 at Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
61A   Kittybrewster (New) on 08/08/1955
61C   Keith 4w/e 26/11/1955
64C   Dalry Road 4w/e 01/07/1961
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 16/06/1962
66D   Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 04/12/1965
     Withdrawn on 31/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 61A Kittybrewster on 08/08/1955
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 26/11/1955
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 09/06/1962
ALLOC 66D Greenock Ladyburn 3w/e 27/11/1965
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/05/1965 Cowlairs Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: 42138/693, 44727/92, 44845/949/91/7, 45034/54/115/82/390, 76050, 73053/100, 80122, 90199; Outside: 45012/28, 45403/51, 73151, 76024. SLS/196506

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/08/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80122
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
26/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
04/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
31/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80122    
04/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane    

prev prev