Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 213 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5128 Week
» 16365 Month
» 249285 Year
» 1914661 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80123 on 09/09/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Wed 09/09/1955 to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
Withdrawal Wed 17/08/1966
Service Life 10 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1966 at Metal Industries (Faslane)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
62B   Dundee Tay Bridge (New) on 09/09/1955
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 24/04/1965
     Withdrawn on 17/08/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 62B Dundee Tay Bridge on 09/09/1955
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 9w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   on 12/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/09/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80123
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
   
24/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
17/08/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80123    
11/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Metal Industries: Faslane    

prev prev