Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 275 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5190 Week
» 16427 Month
» 249347 Year
» 1914723 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80124 on 22/09/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Fri 22/09/1955 to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
Withdrawal Fri 09/12/1966
Service Life 11 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
62B   Dundee Tay Bridge (New) on 22/09/1955
64A   St Margarets 5w/e 29/01/1966
     Withdrawn on 09/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 62B Dundee Tay Bridge on 22/09/1955
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 10/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/07/1961 Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/09/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80124
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
   
29/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
09/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80124    
03/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane    

prev prev