Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 254 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5169 Week
» 16406 Month
» 249326 Year
» 1914702 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80125 on 06/10/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 06/10/1955 to Stirling (63B)
Withdrawal Sat 10/10/1964
Service Life 9 yrs , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1965 at Maden and McKee (Stanley)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
63B   Stirling (New) on 06/10/1955
     Withdrawn   07/07/1964
10D   Lostock Hall (Reinstated) m/e 09/1964
     Withdrawn on 10/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 63B Stirling on 06/10/1955
WDN   on 11/07/1964
REINS 10D Lostock Hall 4w/e 05/09/1964
WDN   w/e 10/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/11/1964 Crewe South MPD (Waiting Works) Ex-Works: 45392, 48458, 48721/45, 92231; Waiting Works: 42468, 42588, 42616, 44773, 45300, 45733, 47354, 47467, 46499, 48001, 48385, 48505, 48697, 48708, 70001/39, 80125, 92160; Stored: 43151, 45553, 45586; Also on shed: 5063, 6819/77, 7023, 7914. SLS/196412
24/01/1965 Crewe South MPD (Ex or waiting works) Ex or waiting works: 42979, 44679/777, 45076/553, 48001/132/94. 70036, 80072/125, 92113/206. SLS/196503

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/10/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80125
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Stirling (63B)
   
09/1964 Reinstated Reinstated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
10/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80125    
05/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Maden and McKee: Stanley    

prev prev