Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 215 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5130 Week
» 16367 Month
» 249287 Year
» 1914663 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80126 on 20/10/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 20/10/1955 to Perth South (63A)
Withdrawal Sat 19/11/1966
Service Life 11 yrs , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1967 at Campbells (Airdrie)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
63A   Perth South (New) on 20/10/1955
     Withdrawn on 19/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 63A Perth South on 20/10/1955
WDN   on 19/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/09/1963 Inverurie Works (In Shops) In Shops: 44724, 45066, 80126; awaiting shops-42737, 45475. Shopped during period 5/8-6/9: 42129, 65234, 65908/22, D6140/3/4. Scrapped during same period: 57565, 61260, 65210/41/60, 67606/15/49/74. Being cup up: 60851, 65316. Awaiting cut up: 60959, 64568, 90536/42. SLS/196310
10/10/1963 Inverurie Works (Shopped) 42737, 42909, 45475, 65918. In Scrap Yard: 60819/27, 64627, 65253/341. Shopped four weeks ended 4/10-44724, 45066, 80126, D6148/50, D8031; Scrapped same period-45049, 60851/959, 64568, 65316, 90193, 90536/42. SLS/196311

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/10/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80126
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Perth South (63A)
   
19/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80126    
01/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev