Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 260 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5175 Week
» 16412 Month
» 249332 Year
» 1914708 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80131 on 02/03/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 02/03/1956 to Plaistow (33A)
Withdrawal Sat 08/05/1965
Service Life 9 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Cohens (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
33A   Plaistow (New) on 02/03/1956
33B   Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
81A   Old Oak Common on 15/07/1962
89A   Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/09/1962
89D   Oswestry 4w/e 09/02/1963
6H   Bangor w/e 23/01/1965
     Withdrawn on 08/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 33A Plaistow on 02/03/1956
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/07/1962
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 89D Oswestry 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 6H Bangor 3w/e 06/02/1965
WDN   w/e 08/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/03/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80131
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Plaistow (33A)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
15/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89D)    
23/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
08/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80131    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev