Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 292 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5207 Week
» 16444 Month
» 249364 Year
» 1914740 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80136 on 11/05/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 11/05/1956 to Plaistow (33A)
Withdrawal Sat 24/07/1965
Service Life 9 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
33A   Plaistow (New) on 11/05/1956
33B   Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
89A   Shrewsbury on 15/07/1962
89D   Oswestry 4w/e 09/02/1963
6F   Machynlleth w/e 27/06/1964
6D   Shrewsbury w/e 19/09/1964
     Withdrawn on 24/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 33A Plaistow on 11/05/1956
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/07/1962
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 89D Oswestry 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 6F Machynlleth 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 3w/e 03/10/1964
WDN   w/e 24/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/04/1963 Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1064-73 (in various stages of construction), D1550 body built (Brush 2750 H.P. D.E.)- New Construction. D210/17, D305/10/16/30/36/43/73, D8003/14/18, 44675/89, 44756, 44810/28, 45410, 45531, 46515/22, 48404/44, 48526, 48680, 70016/23/46, 82042, 92035, 92127/46/52/53 92207/39. Outside Erecting Shop: 45322, 70035, 80136, For Butlin's Camp, Pwllheli 46100, For Butlin's Camp, Skegness 46203. Yard: 42182, 42426/69, 42592, 44877, 45067, 45126, 45481, 46106/08/23/27, 47380, 82036, 92104/201. Paint Shop and Outside: D1062/3, D57, D214, 44710, 44869, 45002/26/33/42, 45481, 46486, 48660, 92044/97/155 78002. Scrap Road: 46124/34/35. SLS/196304
26/03/1966 Awaiting Disposal (Shrewsbury) Shrewsbury: 7801/2/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, 41209, 42174, 42777, 46508, 48716, 73000/25/34/50/67/70, 75028/38, 80048/78/101/36, 84000/4, 90222/563/641; Stafford: 42958/64/82, 46527, 47480/666/777, 48112 (mainly labelled to Cashmore's, Great Bridge). SLS/196605
07/07/1968 Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. SLS/196810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/05/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80136
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Plaistow (33A)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
15/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89D)    
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (6F)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
24/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80136    

prev prev