Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 262 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5177 Week
» 16414 Month
» 249334 Year
» 1914710 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80137 on 28/05/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 28/05/1956 to Neasden (34E)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 31/10/1965
Service Life 9 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Cox and Danks (Park Royal)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
34E   Neasden (New) on 28/05/1956
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 31/12/1959
71A   Eastleigh 4w/e 17/12/1962
70C   Guildford 4w/e 01/04/1963
70B   Feltham 4w/e 16/09/1963
70A   Nine Elms w/e 20/11/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 31/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 34E Neasden on 28/05/1956
LOAN 14D Neasden on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 17/12/1962
ALLOC 70C Guildford 3w/e 01/04/1963
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 2w/e 20/11/1964
WDN   w/e 31/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/08/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-1 bay) 29th August. Paint shop- 40010 G, 42369 G, 43948 I, 44147 I, 47635 I, 75039 G, D3542/3 new, D5001 new; Diesel shop- 10203, 15000 I, 15004 Casual, D3544-D3554 (order no. 658); Erecting shop-1 bay, 40038 G, 42420 I, 42526 G, 44035 I, 44519 G, 44577 G, 47236 G, 47574 G, 47597 G, 48410 I, 75017 I, 75030/3 G, 80137 I, 80138 G, also 53803, 75032, 80061; Erecting shop-2 bay, 43621 G, 44045 I, 44241 G, 44371 G, 47230 G, 48642 G, 48672 G, 53805 I, also 44046 an 48461; Erecting shop-3 bay, 10 Bo-Bos (D5002-11, three engines in), 3 1-Co-Co-ls (D1-3, no engines in). Yard- 40047, 40680, 41078, 41156, 42508, 43631, 43918, 47309, 48176, 75013 an 12098. Test House- D5000 an 10800. SLS/195809
10/03/1960 Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop:-30060/6/133/247/701/88, 34011/5/27/8/33/61/82/92/106, 41304, 73082/112/4, 76019, 80039/42/83/137; Boxhill. Dump:-30770; Ex-works:- 32103, 34050/70, 41312; Waiting works:-30056/129/4035/504, 76055, 80140; Ex-works:- 32104 (75C), 73050 (82F), 80095 (6C) plate, 73118; On shed (damaged):- 34084. SLS/196004

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/05/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80137
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Neasden (34E)
   
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
17/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
01/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
20/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
31/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80137    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Park Royal    

prev prev