Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 232 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5147 Week
» 16384 Month
» 249304 Year
» 1914680 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80138 on 12/06/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 12/06/1956 to Neasden (34E)
Withdrawal Sun 02/10/1966
Service Life 10 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
34E   Neasden (New) on 12/06/1956
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 31/12/1959
75A   Brighton 5w/e 18/03/1961
75B   Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
70F   Bournemouth 4w/e 15/03/1965
     Withdrawn on 02/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 34E Neasden on 12/06/1956
LOAN 14D Neasden on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 18/03/1961
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 6w/e 15/03/1965
WDN   w/e 02/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/08/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-1 bay) 29th August. Paint shop- 40010 G, 42369 G, 43948 I, 44147 I, 47635 I, 75039 G, D3542/3 new, D5001 new; Diesel shop- 10203, 15000 I, 15004 Casual, D3544-D3554 (order no. 658); Erecting shop-1 bay, 40038 G, 42420 I, 42526 G, 44035 I, 44519 G, 44577 G, 47236 G, 47574 G, 47597 G, 48410 I, 75017 I, 75030/3 G, 80137 I, 80138 G, also 53803, 75032, 80061; Erecting shop-2 bay, 43621 G, 44045 I, 44241 G, 44371 G, 47230 G, 48642 G, 48672 G, 53805 I, also 44046 an 48461; Erecting shop-3 bay, 10 Bo-Bos (D5002-11, three engines in), 3 1-Co-Co-ls (D1-3, no engines in). Yard- 40047, 40680, 41078, 41156, 42508, 43631, 43918, 47309, 48176, 75013 an 12098. Test House- D5000 an 10800. SLS/195809
12/05/1963 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/06/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80138
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Neasden (34E)
   
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
18/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
15/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
02/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80138    
02/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev