Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 272 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5187 Week
» 16424 Month
» 249344 Year
» 1914720 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80140 on 10/07/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 10/07/1956 to Neasden (34E)
Withdrawal Sun 09/07/1967
Service Life 10 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Birds (Risca)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
34E   Neasden (New) on 10/07/1956
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 31/12/1959
75A   Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963
75B   Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
70B   Feltham 4w/e 08/06/1965
70A   Nine Elms 4w/e 17/10/1966
     Withdrawn on 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 34E Neasden w/e 10/07/1956
LOAN 14D Neasden on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
TOSTORE 70B Feltham P 06/06/1965
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 17/10/1966
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/11/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-2 bay) 14th Nov. Paint shop- 42524 I, 43975 G, 47438 I, D3561 New, D5003/4 New. D/E shop- 10202, 10800, 12043, 13057/124, 15004, ED7, 10 D/E shunters D3562-71 (Order D658, 60-69). Test House- D5002. Erecting shop-1 bay, 42349 I, 42513 G, 43994 G, 44007 I, 44245 G, 44566 G, 47599 G, 47621 G, 48026 G, 48182 I, 48212 I, 48339 I, 48352 G, 48359 G, 48503 G, 48547 G, 53802 I, 75020 G, 80064 I, 80142 I. Erecting shop-2 bay- 42230 I, 42332 I, 43844, 43972 I, 47404 I, 48114 I, 48415 I, 48662 G, 80140 I. Erecting shop-3 bay- 9 Bo-Bo D/E 1160 H,P. D5005-13, 3 1Co-Col D/E 2300 H.P. D1, D3 an D4. Yard- 40047, 40420, 40680, SLS/195812
10/03/1960 Eastleigh Works (Waiting works) Erecting shop:-30060/6/133/247/701/88, 34011/5/27/8/33/61/82/92/106, 41304, 73082/112/4, 76019, 80039/42/83/137; Boxhill. Dump:-30770; Ex-works:- 32103, 34050/70, 41312; Waiting works:-30056/129/4035/504, 76055, 80140; Ex-works:- 32104 (75C), 73050 (82F), 80095 (6C) plate, 73118; On shed (damaged):- 34084. SLS/196004
12/08/1967 Salisbury MPD On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/07/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80140
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Neasden (34E)
   
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
17/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 80140    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Risca    

prev prev