Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 274 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5189 Week
» 16426 Month
» 249346 Year
» 1914722 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80143 on 10/09/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 10/09/1956 to Neasden (34E)
Withdrawal Sun 09/07/1967
Service Life 10 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Birds (Risca)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
34E   Neasden (New) on 10/09/1956
75A   Brighton 5w/e 31/12/1959
70B   Feltham 4w/e 22/07/1963
70A   Nine Elms w/e 20/11/1964
     Withdrawn on 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 34E Neasden on 10/09/1956
LOAN 14D Neasden on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 22/07/1963
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 2w/e 20/11/1964
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1957 Aylesbury Following the withdrawal of the Watlington branch passenger services, the daily freight working is worked by Aylesbury (34E). The branch is no longer the responsibility of Slough (81B). One of the two Neasden J15's (65390, 65404) is stabled here at fortnightly intervals for this duty. On 18th August, Aylesbury shed housed 1473, 5424, 61028/77, 65390, 67752, 76037 an 80143. The two W.R. locomotives regularly shedded here (1473, 5409) are washed out at Banbury which supplies replacements when this is being done. SLS/195709
17/10/1958 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay) 17th October, 1958. Paint shop-42392 G, 42525 G, 48008 G, 75043 G, 80043 G, D3553/4 (new-Order D658), D5002 (new-order B251). Diesel Erecting Shop- 10202/3, 12090, 15004, D3555-3564 (new-order D658), outside- 10201. Test House- D5001, D5700. Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay- 41157 I, 42324 G, 42328 G, 42502 G, 42508 G, 42524 G, 44082 G, 44304 G, 44516 G, 47674 G, 48305 G, 48324 G, 48332 G, 73023 I, 75040 G. Stripping- 44466, 48363, 80060 an 80144. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay- 42367 I, 47589 G, 48530 G, 48617 I, 80143 I; Stripping- 40694, 42513 an 44137. Yard- 40047, 40680/931, 41167, 42370/513, 43231/301/522/815, 47309, 12096 an 15000. SLS/195811
12/05/1963 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. SLS/196304
12/08/1967 Salisbury MPD On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/09/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80143
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Neasden (34E)
   
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
20/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 80143    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Risca    

prev prev