Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 1000 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2074 Week
» 27435 Month
» 260355 Year
» 1925731 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80147 on 15/11/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 15/11/1956 to Brighton (75A)
Withdrawal Sun 13/06/1965
Service Life 8 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Birds (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
75A   Brighton (New) on 15/11/1956
71G   Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 22/07/1963
71B   Bournemouth 4w/e 19/08/1963
     Withdrawn on 13/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 75A Brighton on 15/11/1956
ALLOC 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 22/07/1963
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 19/08/1963
WDN   w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/11/1959 Southern Region floods 4th-6/11/1959. Unique in that on the second day (Sat., Nov. 5th) as far as possible a half-hourly service was operated such as only scheduled or attempted with electric multiple-units introduced in 1935, was the emergency steam working between Brighton and Eastbourne calling at intermediate stations, on account of severe flooding through the two-sided junction station at the county town, Lewes, necessitating withdrawal of all electric trains for 2 or more days on the Brighton side; for more than a week on the Haywards Heath-London side. It was not possible for the steam locOrnotives as a rule to keep intermediate timings but it was a great effort by all concerned over steep gradients 'twixt Lewes and Brighton under hazardous conditions, for instance. Saturday loads were 4-5 bogies though on Friday with fewer trains up to 8-9 modern coaches were hauled on some trips presenting a tough proposition as the engines were of a mixed character with crews hastily gathered together. Some complete outfits were from the Brighton-Uckfield (Tunbridge Wells) route closed temporarily by other flooding. Mr. S. C. Nash kindly supplied the following list of locomotives sharing in the handling of the emergency passenger service, Nov. 4th-6th :- Tender: 34098 'West Country'; 30546, 'Q', 31686, 31724, 'C', 0-6-0s; 31825, 'N', 31902/7, 'Ul', 32337/41-2, 'K' ex-L.B.S.C.R., 2.6-0s; 75075, B.R. class 4 4-6-0. Tank: 30053/6 'M7' ex-L.S.W.R. motor fitted, also partly on Seaford branch; 80032/81/146/7/52-4, B.R. class 4 2-6-4T. There were also part time two Hastings-London 6-car diesel-electric sets having greater accelerative capacity. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/11/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80147
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Brighton (75A)
   
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G)    
19/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
13/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80147    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Morriston    

prev prev