Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 278 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5193 Week
» 16430 Month
» 249350 Year
» 1914726 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80149 on 13/12/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 13/12/1956 to Brighton (75A)
Withdrawal Sun 07/03/1965
Service Life 8 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1965 at Cox and Danks (Park Royal)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
75A   Brighton (New) on 13/12/1956
75B   Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
     Withdrawn on 07/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 75A Brighton on 15/12/1956
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 07/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/12/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80149
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Brighton (75A)
   
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
07/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80149    
06/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Park Royal    

prev prev