Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1101 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18904 Week
» 71920 Month
» 191447 Year
» 3218300 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8015 |
20/12/1957 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20015 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
20/12/1957 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/12/1957 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/12/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8015 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
19/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
08/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
01/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20015 |
|
|
13/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20015 |
|
|
10/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Thornaby MPD |
|
|