Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 288 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5203 Week
» 16440 Month
» 249360 Year
» 1914736 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80152 on 06/02/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 06/02/1957 to Brighton (75A)
Withdrawal Sun 09/07/1967
Service Life 10 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Birds (Risca)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
75A   Brighton (New) on 06/02/1957
75B   Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
70E   Salisbury 4w/e 08/06/1965
70D   Eastleigh 4w/e 17/10/1966
     Withdrawn on 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 75A Brighton on 06/02/1957
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
ALLOC 70E Salisbury P 06/06/1965
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 17/10/1966
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/11/1959 Southern Region floods 4th-6/11/1959. Unique in that on the second day (Sat., Nov. 5th) as far as possible a half-hourly service was operated such as only scheduled or attempted with electric multiple-units introduced in 1935, was the emergency steam working between Brighton and Eastbourne calling at intermediate stations, on account of severe flooding through the two-sided junction station at the county town, Lewes, necessitating withdrawal of all electric trains for 2 or more days on the Brighton side; for more than a week on the Haywards Heath-London side. It was not possible for the steam locOrnotives as a rule to keep intermediate timings but it was a great effort by all concerned over steep gradients 'twixt Lewes and Brighton under hazardous conditions, for instance. Saturday loads were 4-5 bogies though on Friday with fewer trains up to 8-9 modern coaches were hauled on some trips presenting a tough proposition as the engines were of a mixed character with crews hastily gathered together. Some complete outfits were from the Brighton-Uckfield (Tunbridge Wells) route closed temporarily by other flooding. Mr. S. C. Nash kindly supplied the following list of locomotives sharing in the handling of the emergency passenger service, Nov. 4th-6th :- Tender: 34098 'West Country'; 30546, 'Q', 31686, 31724, 'C', 0-6-0s; 31825, 'N', 31902/7, 'Ul', 32337/41-2, 'K' ex-L.B.S.C.R., 2.6-0s; 75075, B.R. class 4 4-6-0. Tank: 30053/6 'M7' ex-L.S.W.R. motor fitted, also partly on Seaford branch; 80032/81/146/7/52-4, B.R. class 4 2-6-4T. There were also part time two Hastings-London 6-car diesel-electric sets having greater accelerative capacity. SLS/196102
12/08/1967 Salisbury MPD On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/02/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80152
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Brighton (75A)
   
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
17/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
09/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 80152    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Risca    

prev prev