Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4177 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17583 Week
» 70599 Month
» 190126 Year
» 3216979 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D805 |
13/05/1959 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
BENBOW |
13/05/1959 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
42 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
437 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 1 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
13/05/1959 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
24/10/1972 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
13 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,281,000 miles |
Cut Up |
16/05/1973 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
MFYE |
Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/05/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D805, name: BENBOW Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
24/10/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 805 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
16/05/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|