Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1786 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19589 Week
» 72605 Month
» 192132 Year
» 3218985 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8076 |
26/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20076 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
26/07/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/07/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
08/1975 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8076 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2982 Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
08/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20076 |
|
|
08/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/05/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20076 from Immingham (IM) |
|
|
10/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Thornaby MPD |
|
|