Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1512 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19315 Week
» 72331 Month
» 191858 Year
» 3218711 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8081 |
31/08/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20081 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2987/8239 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
31/08/1961 to Eastfield (65A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
31/08/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/08/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8081 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2987 Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
31/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
12/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20081 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
20/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Wigston (WG) |
|
|