Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3415 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16821 Week
» 69837 Month
» 189364 Year
» 3216217 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8083 |
12/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20083 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (20/9) |
20903 |
11/05/1989 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 20 | 12/09/1961 | 20/9 | 11/05/1989 |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2989/8241 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
12/09/1961 to Eastfield (65A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
12/09/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
16/11/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1972 |
|
Cabside tablet recess filled in |
|
|
|
|
02/1972 |
|
Tablet Catcher recesses filled |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/09/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
16/11/1971 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8083 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2989 Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
16/11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Cabside tablet recess filled in |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Tablet Catcher recesses filled |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20083 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
11/05/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20903 |
|
|