Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3442 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16848 Week
» 69864 Month
» 189391 Year
» 3216244 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8101 |
22/11/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20101 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (20/9) |
20901 |
29/03/1989 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 20 | 22/11/1961 | 20/9 | 29/03/1989 |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
22/11/1961 to Eastfield (65A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
22/11/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/11/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8101 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
10/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20101 |
|
|
29/03/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20901 |
|
|