Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1656 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19459 Week
» 72475 Month
» 192002 Year
» 3218855 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8176 |
16/11/1966 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20176 |
06/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
16/11/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1971 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1972 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1983 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1983 |
|
Guard brake valve fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/11/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
09/1972 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
12/1983 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/11/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8176 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
09/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20176 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
12/1983 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1983 |
Modification |
Modification: Guard brake valve fitted |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
21/10/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20176 |
|
|
18/01/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|