Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 484 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 484 Week
» 27105 Month
» 27105 Year
» 1692481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8191 25/02/1967  
TOPS (20/0) 20191 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2025/02/1967
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Central Headcode Box
To Service 25/02/1967 to Nottingham Division (D16)
Withdrawn 09/11/1987
Time in Service 20 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys
Cut Up 30/11/1987
Cut At Vic Berry (Leicester)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D16 Nottingham Division (New) on 25/02/1967
64B Haymarket w/e 24/03/1973
   Withdrawn on 09/11/1987

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
02/1972   Slow Speed Control fitted        


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
25/02/1967 To Service To service as British Railways Number D8191
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16)
   
02/1972 Modified Modification: Slow Speed Control fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20191 (20/0)    
24/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
09/11/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 20191    
30/11/1987 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev