Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 840 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18643 Week
» 71659 Month
» 191186 Year
» 3218039 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
82001 |
on |
18/04/1952 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/04/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 82001 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (6E) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
23/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (86C) |
|
|
04/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
31/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 82001 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|