Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 970 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2044 Week
» 27405 Month
» 260325 Year
» 1925701 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 82007 on 30/05/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 392
To Service Thu 30/05/1952 to Tyseley (84E)
Withdrawal Thu 25/06/1964
Service Life 12 yrs , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
84E   Tyseley (New) on 30/05/1952
84E   Tyseley 4w/e 14/06/1952
88C   Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 16/07/1955
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/12/1955
84H   Wellington 4w/e 12/06/1958
84D   Leamington 4w/e 14/06/1958
84K   Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 09/08/1958
85A   Worcester 4w/e 06/09/1958
82A   Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 04/10/1958
82E   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
82B   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 25/02/1961
82E   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
     Withdrawn on 25/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1952
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 84K Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 25/02/1961
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
WDN   w/e 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/05/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 82007
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (84K)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
25/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
25/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 82007    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev