Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 27 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2102 Week
» 27463 Month
» 260383 Year
» 1925759 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 82008 on 05/06/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 392
To Service Fri 05/06/1952 to Tyseley (84E)
Withdrawal Fri 07/02/1964
Service Life 11 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Locomotive Works (Eastleigh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
84E   Tyseley (New) on 05/06/1952
84E   Tyseley 4w/e 14/06/1952
88C   Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 10/09/1955
85A   Worcester 4w/e 07/09/1957
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 30/11/1957
85A   Worcester 4w/e 25/01/1958
89C   Machynlleth 4w/e 15/07/1961
87H   Neyland 4w/e 07/10/1961
83B   Taunton 4w/e 04/11/1961
     Withdrawn on 07/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 14/06/1952
NEW 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 15/07/1961
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 04/11/1961
WDN   on 07/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1961 Whitland MPD 82008/30/42/4 have been allocated here. SLS/196110
19/08/1962 Wolverhampton Works (In Works) In Works: 1020, 1630, 3615, 3721, 4636, 4697, 4703, 5181/4, 5564, 6160, 6614/8, 7739, 7816, 8104, 9422/70, 9613/24/6/47/65, 82008; Weigh house: 6156; Awaiting works: 3217, 4938/61, 5065, 5658, 7002, 7824, 9415. SLS/196209
31/05/1964 Eastleigh Works (Scrap Yard) Works Yard, Waiting Works: 73050, 73083. Works Yard, Ex Works: 34089, 73114. Erecting Shop: 30069, 32640, 32678 Undergoing restoration, 34005, 34018, 34026, 34037, 34042, 34076, 35007, 35019 35022/3, 73052, 73085/9, 76067, 76082, 80016, 80145, 80154, 15218, 15233, 20002, D3041, D3220, D3459, D3667, D6547, D6554. Scrap Yard: 30133 Intact, 34049 Remains, 82008 Intact. SLS/196407

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/06/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 82008
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
10/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
07/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
07/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 82008    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Eastleigh    

prev prev