Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 849 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14892 Week
» 79846 Month
» 282510 Year
» 3309363 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
82024 |
on |
29/10/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/10/1954 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
24/09/1962 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
19/11/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/01/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/01/1963 |
Eastleigh Works (erecting shop) |
In erecting shop: 4634, 31619, 31800/16/73, 33009/12, 34031/9/70, 35001/15, 41296/9, 73002/51, 76005/62, 80034/43/82/162, 82014/24, 92206. In Works yard: 30512, 31618, 34054, 35006, 41291, 80035, 82022. On scrap sidings behind Works: 30504, 30903/4, 31414, 31904, 32352. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/10/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 82024 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
24/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
30/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 82024 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|