Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1109 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18912 Week
» 71928 Month
» 191455 Year
» 3218308 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
82029 |
on |
13/12/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/12/1954 |
York MPD |
Fort William shed is not often represented at York, but on 14/12/54 62031 (K1-63D) was at York shed after a visit to Doncaster Works. 67745 (L1-34D) was at York on 15/12/54 after a visit to Darlington, and 67780 (L1-34E) in similar circumstances on 31/12/54. On 20/12/54 new BR Standard 2-6-4T 80113. from Doncaster Works was at York, en route for the Scottish Region, and fitted with tablet exchange apparatus. On the same date a surprising arrival at York was 69369 (N5-34E), en route for Darlington Works for repair owing to an alleged surplus of repair work at Gorton with a corresponding shortage at Darlington. 69369 was apparently overcome by its long journey, as a hot bearing developed necessitating attention at York shed; it reappeared in York shed yard on 30/12/54. 63755 (O1-54B), fitted with additional pumps for the Tyne Dock-Consett working, was also at York on the same date. On 28/12/54 46469 (30E) was at York after a visit to Darlington Works. 44669 (68A) worked the Holbeck duty on the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City-Scarborough, etc., on 28/12/54, and the same duty was taken on 30/12/54 by 44792 (68A). 73066 (20A) has continued appearances on this turn, while 73065 (19B) has also visited York on Millhouses turns, particularly the 10.20 a.m. Bristol-Newcastle. On 29/12/54 the 3.55 p.m. relief arrival at York from Birmingham (New Street) was worked by 42756 (17B). On 31/12/54 new BR Standard 2-6-2T 82029 was at York on arrival in the North Eastern Region from Swindon. Ex-Works engines on shed or this date also included 61215, (B1-53B), 67780 (L1-34E), and 90382 (AY-53A). |
SLS/195501 |
12/08/1967 |
Salisbury MPD |
On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. |
SLS/196709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/12/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 82029 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
20/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
14/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 82029 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Risca |
|
|