Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 347 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4324 Week
» 15561 Month
» 248481 Year
» 1913857 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 82030 on 21/12/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 399
To Service Fri 21/12/1954 to Barry (88C)
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1965
Service Life 11 yrs , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
88C   Barry (New) on 21/12/1954
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/05/1955
85A   Worcester 4w/e 31/12/1955
82A   Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 18/04/1959
85A   Worcester 4w/e 16/05/1959
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 13/06/1959
85A   Worcester 4w/e 11/07/1959
84H   Wellington 4w/e 31/10/1959
82A   Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 30/01/1960
82E   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
83B   Taunton 4w/e 04/11/1961
83D   Exmouth Junction 7w/e 22/06/1964
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 13/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 02/08/1965
82F   Bath Green Park (S&D) (Reinstated) on 22/11/1965
     Withdrawn on 31/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/12/1954
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 13/06/1959
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 13/06/1965
REINS 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 08/08/1965
WDN   4w/e 08/08/1965
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 3w/e 27/11/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1961 Whitland MPD 82008/30/42/4 have been allocated here. SLS/196110
08/08/1965 Cancelled withdrawals Although the P.R.O. showed 82030/44 as withdrawn, both locos have since been noted in steam and the P.R.O. himself has given 82044 as transferred again since then. Failing an official correction it seems a fair assumption that the correct entry for these two locos should read: 82030/44 to 82E SLS/196512

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/12/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 82030
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Barry (88C)
   
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
31/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
13/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
22/11/1965 Reinstated Reinstated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
31/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 82030    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev