Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3919 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17325 Week
» 70341 Month
» 189868 Year
» 3216721 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8205 |
28/04/1958 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
28/04/1958 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
01/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/04/1958 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
21/05/1960 |
25/06/1960 |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
|
36 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
11/02/1963 |
19/05/1963 |
General |
|
|
|
98 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
|
24/01/1965 |
FROST |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/04/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8205 Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
19/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/05/1960. Dep: 25/06/1960. |
|
|
11/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
04/08/1961 |
Works Visit |
Depot Repair - Ipswich (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/08/1961. Dep: 26/08/1961. |
|
|
17/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/02/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1963. Dep: 19/05/1963. |
|
|
24/01/1965 |
Works Visit |
|
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
04/08/1968 |
To Store |
To Store at Stratford (30A) |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8205 |
|
|
04/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|