Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3574 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17617 Week
» 82571 Month
» 285235 Year
» 3312088 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8213 |
09/12/1959 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
15 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star |
|
To Service |
09/12/1959 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
22/12/1968 |
Time in Service |
9 yrs , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 04/1969 |
Cut At |
Cohens (Kettering) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
09/12/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
01/1968 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
31B |
|
March (New) |
on |
09/12/1959 |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/12/1968 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/12/1959 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
29/08/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8213 Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
22/12/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8213 |
|
|
04/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|