Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 172 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19083 Week
» 84037 Month
» 286701 Year
» 3313554 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8216 |
31/12/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
31/12/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/12/1959 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
10/10/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8216 Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8216 |
|
|
01/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|