Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1374 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14780 Week
» 67796 Month
» 187323 Year
» 3214176 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D838 |
03/10/1960 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
RAPID |
03/10/1960 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
43 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L100 |
Works Number |
27967 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
03/10/1960 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
27/03/1971 |
Time in Service |
10 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys |
Total Mileage |
715,000 miles |
Cut Up |
29/07/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
MFYE |
Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/10/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
21/04/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
31/08/1962 |
Severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D838, name: RAPID Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27967 Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
31/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 838 |
|
|
29/07/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|