Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 580 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18383 Week
» 71399 Month
» 190926 Year
» 3217779 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D840 |
03/02/1961 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
RESISTANCE |
03/02/1961 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
43 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L100 |
Works Number |
27969 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
03/02/1961 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
26/04/1969 |
Time in Service |
8 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys |
Total Mileage |
599,000 miles |
Cut Up |
26/05/1971 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/02/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/02/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D840, name: RESISTANCE Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27969 Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
26/04/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 840 |
|
|
26/05/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|