Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2091 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19894 Week
» 72910 Month
» 192437 Year
» 3219290 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
84000 |
on |
04/07/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/03/1966 |
Awaiting Disposal (Shrewsbury) |
Shrewsbury: 7801/2/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, 41209, 42174, 42777, 46508, 48716, 73000/25/34/50/67/70, 75028/38, 80048/78/101/36, 84000/4, 90222/563/641; Stafford: 42958/64/82, 46527, 47480/666/777, 48112 (mainly labelled to Cashmore's, Great Bridge). |
SLS/196605 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/07/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 84000 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plodder Lane (10D) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
13/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89D) |
|
|
23/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C) |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 84000 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport |
|
|