Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 702 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14108 Week
» 67124 Month
» 186651 Year
» 3213504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
84007 |
on |
31/08/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/03/1959 |
Higham Ferrers branch |
On 2nd and 3rd March J6 64256 (15E) worked the Higham Ferrers branch goods but on 4th March it was put into store at Wellingboro-the passenger service was being worked by 84007. |
SLS/195904 |
13/06/1959 |
Last trains |
The locomotives on last trains on 13th June were as follows - 46496 (Cambridge-Kettering), 46467 ( Kettering-Cambridge), 41227 (Rugby-Leamington)), 41285 (Leamington- Rugby), 58065 (Southwell, then light engine to Lincoln), 84007 (Higham Ferrers). |
SLS/195907 |
31/10/1962 |
Annesley MPD |
The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. |
SLS/196212 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 84007 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
14/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (16D) |
|
|
14/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
18/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 84007 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Albert Looms: Spondon |
|
|