Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2892 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16298 Week
» 69314 Month
» 188841 Year
» 3215694 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
84009 |
on |
03/09/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/09/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 84009 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Royston (20C) |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Skipton (20F) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (20C) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
21/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C) |
|
|
13/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
20/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 84009 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|