Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1684 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15090 Week
» 68106 Month
» 187633 Year
» 3214486 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
84029 |
on |
11/06/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/01/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Ex-works) |
Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. |
SLS/196002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 84029 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (14E) |
|
|
20/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
16/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
13/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 84029 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|