Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 33 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2108 Week
» 27469 Month
» 260389 Year
» 1925765 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 8454 on 31/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Number Unk
Works Number 2447
To Service Thu 31/12/1949 to Leamington (LMTN)
Withdrawal Thu 12/01/1961
Service Life 11 yrs , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1961 at Cohens (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
LMTN   Leamington (New) on 31/12/1949
87B   Duffryn Yard 4w/e 11/08/1951
87B   Duffryn Yard 4w/e 31/08/1951
     Withdrawn on 12/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW LMTN Leamington m/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 11/08/1951
WDN   m/e 31/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/02/1961 Swindon Works (Works Yard) Gas Works Sidings: 1502/9, 1603/52, 3638/49, 3704, 4203, 5103/10/76, 6752/3/61/76, 7740, 8406/76, 9400/14/47/9/58, 9795. Stock Shed Yard: 1361/4, 1410/33/54, 4644, 5920, 6158, 6336, 7410/3, 7761, 8473. Triangle: 1366, 2227, 3799, 4170, 4287, 4587, 4978, 5207, 5519, 6425, 6864, 6979, 7704/76, 8457. Works Yard: 1014/25, 1625/9, 2207, 2516, 4099, 4701, 4902/15/81/5, 5025, 6003, 6131, 6945/53/61, 7000/20, 7325, 7775/94, 7902, 8454, 9481, 9701/49, 18000, 78000/8, L.T.E. L91. 'A' Shop: D604, D800/9/11/8/20/66-70, D1000-5, D2187-92, D3000/27, D3182, D6301/3/5, 7, 1017, 3806, 4073/4, 4128/31/48, 4274, 4574, 4919/24/7/30/5/54, 5008/19/27/9/32/68/71, 5900/23/72/85/6, 6023/7/9, 6122/44/7, 6368, 6822/51, 6917/29/36/51, 7033, 7908, 15100/4, 70024, 82032/9, 92232. Dump: 1601/2/10/20/59, 2813/9/32, 4550/9/94, 5331/91, 5510/4, 6333/52, 6775, 8419, 9462. 'C' Shop: 1616/44, 2846, 4281, 6382. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1949 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8454
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 2447
Allocated to Leamington (LMTN)
   
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
12/01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 8454    
06/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev