Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 778 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6178 Week
» 24230 Month
» 257150 Year
» 1922526 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 8465 on 30/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Number Unk
Works Number 2458
To Service Fri 30/11/1950 to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)
Withdrawal Fri 22/11/1963
Service Life 12 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
87A   Neath (Court Sart) (New) on 30/11/1950
87B   Duffryn Yard 4w/e 02/12/1950
87B   Duffryn Yard 4w/e 31/12/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 16/06/1951
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 6w/e 30/06/1951
88C   Barry 4w/e 26/01/1952
88C   Barry 4w/e 29/02/1952
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 21/03/1953
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 14/08/1954
88C   Barry 4w/e 06/10/1956
82C   Swindon 4w/e 27/12/1958
81C   Southall 4w/e 11/08/1962
     Withdrawn on 22/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 82C Swindon m/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 11/08/1962
WDN   4w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/11/1950 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8465
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 2458
Allocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)
   
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
29/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
14/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
11/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    
22/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 8465    

prev prev