Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 815 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6215 Week
» 24267 Month
» 257187 Year
» 1922563 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 8471 on 31/05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Number Unk
Works Number 2464
To Service Wed 31/05/1951 to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)
Withdrawal Wed 16/06/1965
Service Life 14 yrs , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
88D   Merthyr Tydfil (New) on 31/05/1951
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 16/06/1951
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 6w/e 30/06/1951
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 29/12/1951
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 31/01/1952
88A   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 24/03/1962
88L   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 27/07/1963
82E   Bristol Barrow Road 2w/e 23/01/1965
     Withdrawn on 16/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1951
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 24/03/1962
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 27/07/1963
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 2w/e 24/01/1965
WDN   on 16/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/05/1951 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8471
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 2464
Allocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)
   
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
31/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
23/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
16/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 8471    
10/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev