Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1561 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14967 Week
» 67983 Month
» 187510 Year
» 3214363 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8475 |
on |
30/11/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
94xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
Order Number |
Unk |
Works Number |
2469 |
To Service |
Mon 30/11/1951 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/09/1964 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/11/1951 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8475 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 2469 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
31/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
08/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
07/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8475 |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|