Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 522 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18325 Week
» 71341 Month
» 190868 Year
» 3217721 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D850 |
08/06/1961 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
SWIFT |
08/06/1961 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
43 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L100 |
Works Number |
27979 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
08/06/1961 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
22/05/1971 |
Time in Service |
9 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys |
Total Mileage |
654,000 miles |
Cut Up |
03/03/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/06/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
04/06/1964 |
Severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D850, name: SWIFT Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27979 Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
03/1969 |
To Store |
To Store at Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
05/1969 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 850 |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
To Store |
To Store at Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
03/03/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|