Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3613 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17019 Week
» 70035 Month
» 189562 Year
» 3216415 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D852 |
24/07/1961 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
TENACIOUS |
24/07/1961 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
43 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L100 |
Works Number |
27981 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
24/07/1961 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
03/10/1971 |
Time in Service |
10 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys |
Total Mileage |
704,000 miles |
Cut Up |
02/06/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/07/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
05/06/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
05/04/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D852, name: TENACIOUS Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27981 Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
06/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
31/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
03/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
12/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 852 |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
02/06/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|