Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2625 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16031 Week
» 69047 Month
» 188574 Year
» 3215427 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D860 |
22/01/1962 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
VICTORIOUS |
22/01/1962 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
43 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L100 |
Works Number |
27989 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
22/01/1962 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
27/03/1971 |
Time in Service |
9 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys |
Total Mileage |
751,000 miles |
Cut Up |
04/12/1971 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
01/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/01/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/01/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D860, name: VICTORIOUS Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27989 Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 860 |
|
|
04/12/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|