Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 790 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14833 Week
» 79787 Month
» 282451 Year
» 3309304 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D867 |
26/04/1961 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
ZENITH |
26/04/1961 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
42 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
448 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 1 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
26/04/1961 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
18/10/1971 |
Time in Service |
10 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys |
Total Mileage |
991,000 miles |
Cut Up |
30/09/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 09/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/04/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/04/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D867, name: ZENITH Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
09/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
18/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 867 |
|
|
30/09/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|