|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1946 | Swindon Works | Locos entering works during January: 207/42/70, 1751/86, 2084, 2116, 2221/74, 2679, 2766, 2802/11/53/62/98, 2912/51, 3034, 3188, 3219/64, 3754, 3808/63, 4004/13/7/21, 4125, 4299, 4326, 4539/47/98, 4615, 4811/5/54, 4909/51/6/63/90, 5019/46/55/6/80, 5161, 5361, 5403, 5534/40/52/65, 5906/25/51/72/4/85, 6003/10/4/9/22/6, 6112, 6314/45/7/56, 6690, 6721, 6919/61/5, 7300/9, 7700/8, 7804, 8359, 8704/14/22/70, 9301, 9768/89/91, WD 71488, 75046. | SLS/194604 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1931 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 8714 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6694 |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) | ||
03/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
23/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
12/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westbury (82D) | ||
02/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
11/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) | ||
09/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
12/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) | ||
27/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 8714 | ||
04/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |